NH SB470 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-04 - Signed by the Governor on 05/30/2018; Chapter 0140; Effective 05/30/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-04 - Signed by the Governor on 05/30/2018; Chapter 0140; Effective 05/30/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to positions within the insurance department.
Title
Relative to positions within the insurance department.
Sponsors
Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Sen. William Gannon [R] | Sen. Bette Lasky [D] | Rep. Edward Butler [D] |
Rep. Carol McGuire [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-04 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 05/30/2018; Chapter 0140; Effective 05/30/2018 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 04/26/2018); Senate Journal 15 |
2018-05-01 | House | Enrolled 04/26/2018 |
2018-04-12 | House | Referral Waived by Committee Chair per House Rule 46(f) 04/12/2018 House Journal 12 P. 26 |
2018-04-12 | House | Referred to Finance 04/12/2018 House Journal 12 P. 9 |
2018-04-12 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/12/2018 House Journal 12 P. 9 |
2018-04-04 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2018-04-04 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 04/12/2018 (Vote 10-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 7 |
2018-03-28 | House | Executive Session: 04/03/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-03-14 | House | Public Hearing: 03/20/2018 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-03-12 | House | Introduced 03/07/2018 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 7 P. 52 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/15/2018; Senate Journal 4 |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/15/2018; Senate Calendar 7 |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Hearing: 01/16/2018, Room 103, State House, 02:00 pm; Senate Calendar 3 |
2017-12-20 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Finance; Senate Journal 1 |