NH SB477 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-14 - Signed by the Governor on 06/08/2018; Chapter 0228; Effective 08/07/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-14 - Signed by the Governor on 06/08/2018; Chapter 0228; Effective 08/07/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a therapeutic cannabis medical oversight board.
Title
Establishing a therapeutic cannabis medical oversight board.
Sponsors
Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] | Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Sen. David Watters [D] | Sen. John Reagan [R] |
Rep. Frank Kotowski [R] | Rep. Jerry Knirk [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-14 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/08/2018; Chapter 0228; Effective 08/07/2018 |
2018-05-23 | House | Enrolled 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/10/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-1935e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/10/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-15 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-1935e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-02 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2018 |
2018-04-25 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 05/02/2018 (Vote 16-3; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 17 P. 6 |
2018-04-25 | House | Executive Session: 04/24/2018 Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-04-10 | House | Public Hearing: 04/17/2018 10:15 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-04-05 | House | Referred to Executive Departments and Administration 04/05/2018 House Journal 11 P. 15 |
2018-04-05 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/05/2018 House Journal 11 P. 15 |
2018-03-28 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2018-03-28 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 04/05/2018 (Vote 15-5; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 7 |
2018-03-27 | House | Executive Session: 03/27/2018 Legislative Office Building 205 |
2018-03-20 | House | Public Hearing: 03/27/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2018-03-12 | House | Introduced 03/07/2018 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 7 P. 52 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-0306s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/01/2018; Senate Journal 3 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2018-0306s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/01/2018; Senate Journal 3 |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0306s, 02/01/2018; Senate Calendar 5 |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Hearing: 01/24/2018, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 02:00 pm; Senate Calendar 4 |
2017-12-20 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 1 |