NH SB478 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to food in cigar shops.
Title
Relative to food in cigar shops.
Sponsors
Sen. Harold French [R] | Rep. Jon Morgan [D] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Sen. Melanie Levesque [D] |
Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Sen. Howard Pearl [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-23 | House | Died on Table |
2020-06-30 | House | Vacated and Laid on Table Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 2 |
2020-03-10 | House | Executive Session: 03/17/2020 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2020-03-10 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 03/17/2020 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2020-02-27 | House | Public Hearing: 03/05/2020 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2020-02-03 | House | Introduced 01/09/2020 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 2 P. 59 |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-0189s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 01/30/2020; Senate Journal 2 |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2020-0189s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/30/2020; Senate Journal 2 |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0189s, 01/30/2020; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 4 |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Hearing: 01/22/2020, Room 100, State House, 01:45 pm; Senate Calendar 3 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 1 |