NH SB486 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to insurance plans that cover maternity benefits.
Title
Relative to insurance plans that cover maternity benefits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Laid on Table (Y: 10 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Floor Amendment 1135s (Y: 10 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Laid on Table (Y: 10 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Floor Amendment 1135s (Y: 10 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-23 | House | Died on Table |
2020-06-30 | House | Introduced and Laid on Table Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 5 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/11/2020; Senate Journal 6 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Sen. Giuda Moved Laid on Table, Regular Calendar 10Y-14N, Motion Failed; 03/11/2020; Senate Journal 6 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Sen. Birdsell Floor Amendment # 2020-1135s, Regular Calendar 10Y-14N, Amendment Failed; 03/11/2020; Senate Journal 6 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/11/2020; Senate Calendar 10 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Hearing: 02/18/2020, Room 100, State House, 02:15 pm; Senate Calendar 7 |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 2 |