NH SB487 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on July 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-05 - II. Remainder shall take effect 07/02/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on July 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-05 - II. Remainder shall take effect 07/02/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to requirements for certain alcohol and other drug use professionals and establishing a state substance use disorder treatment services program.
Title
Relative to requirements for certain alcohol and other drug use professionals and establishing a state substance use disorder treatment services program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-21 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-05 | Senate | II. Remainder shall take effect 07/02/2018 |
2018-07-05 | Senate | I. Section 6-11 Effective 09/30/2018 |
2018-07-05 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/02/2018; Chapter 0364 |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-06-11 | House | Enrolled 05/23/2018 |
2018-06-06 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-2111e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-06-05 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-2111e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2018 |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Conference Committee Report # 2018-1978c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/23/2018; Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-23 | House | Conference Committee Report 1978c: Adopted, Voice Vote 05/23/2018 |
2018-05-17 | House | Conference Committee Report # 2018-1978c Filed 05/17/2018; House Amendment + New Amendment |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Committee of Conference Meeting: 05/14/2018, 01:00 pm, Room 100, State House |
2018-05-10 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps. Beaudoin, Schultz, Sytek, Hansen 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-10 | House | House Accedes to Senate Request for CofC (Rep. McGuire): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Bradley, Gray, Feltes; 05/10/2018; Senate Journal 17 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved Nonconcur with the House Amendment; Requests C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/10/2018; Senate Journal 17 |
2018-05-02 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1750h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2018 |
2018-05-02 | House | Amendment # 2018-1750h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2018 |
2018-04-25 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1750h (NT) for 05/02/2018 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 17 P. 6 |
2018-04-25 | House | Executive Session: 04/24/2018 Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-04-17 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 04/24/2018 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-04-12 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 04/17/2018 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2018-03-28 | House | Public Hearing: 04/11/2018 02:15 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-03-27 | House | Introduced 03/22/2018 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 10 P. 53 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-1098s, Regular Calendar 22Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/21/2018; Senate Journal 9 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2018-1098s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/21/2018; Senate Journal 9 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1098s, 03/21/2018; Senate Calendar 13 |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Hearing: 01/25/2018, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 4 |
2017-12-20 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 1 |