NH SB487 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-06 - Without Objection, Sen. Birdsell Moved the Question, Motion Adopted; 03/05/2020; Senate Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Repealing the housing appeals board and establishing a commission to advance affordable housing in New Hampshire.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repealing the housing appeals board and establishing a commission to advance affordable housing in New Hampshire.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-06SenateWithout Objection, Sen. Birdsell Moved the Question, Motion Adopted; 03/05/2020; Senate Journal 5
2020-03-05SenateInexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 03/05/2020; Senate Journal 5
2020-02-18SenateCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 03/05/2020; Senate Calendar 9
2020-02-13SenateHearing: 02/18/2020, Room 100, State House, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 7
2020-01-08SenateTo Be Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 1
2020-01-08SenateInadvertently referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs and will be referred to Judiciary, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/08/2020; Senate Journal 1

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback