NH SB488 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Passed on June 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-18 - Signed by the Governor on 06/14/2018; Chapter 0266; Effective 06/14/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Passed on June 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-18 - Signed by the Governor on 06/14/2018; Chapter 0266; Effective 06/14/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to licensure of health care professionals employed at the Manchester Veterans Affairs Medical Center.
Title
Relative to licensure of health care professionals employed at the Manchester Veterans Affairs Medical Center.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-18 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/14/2018; Chapter 0266; Effective 06/14/2018 |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-29 | House | Enrolled 05/23/2018 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/10/2018; Senate Journal 17 |
2018-05-02 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1665h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2018 |
2018-05-02 | House | Amendment # 2018-1665h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2018 |
2018-04-25 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1665h for 05/02/2018 (Vote 14-4; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 17 P. 17 |
2018-04-25 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 04/24/2018 Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-04-05 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 04/04/2018 Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-03-20 | House | ==ROOM CHANGE== Public Hearing: 04/04/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2018-03-12 | House | Introduced 03/07/2018 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 7 P. 52 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/01/2018; Senate Journal 3 |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/01/2018; Senate Calendar 5 |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Hearing: 01/25/2018, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 4 |
2017-12-20 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 1 |