NH SB49 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-1734h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/08/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the state fire code.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the state fire code.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-08HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1734h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/08/2019
2019-05-08HouseAmendment # 2019-1734h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/08/2019
2019-05-01HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1734h for 05/08/2019 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 23 P. 4
2019-04-23HouseExecutive Session: 04/30/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306
2019-04-03HousePublic Hearing: 04/10/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306
2019-04-01HouseIntroduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 11 P. 73
2019-03-28SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11
2019-03-28SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-1201s, Amendment Failed, Voice Vote; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11
2019-03-20SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1201s, 03/28/2019; Senate Calendar 15
2019-02-20SenateHearing: 03/13/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 12
2019-01-17SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback