NH SB5 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Sen. Sherman Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Making an appropriation to the department of health and human services for Medicaid provider rates for mental health and substance use disorder and emergency shelter and stabilization services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Making an appropriation to the department of health and human services for Medicaid provider rates for mental health and substance use disorder and emergency shelter and stabilization services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-08 - Senate - OTPA (Y: 207 N: 130 NV: 33 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15SenateSen. Sherman Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16
2019-05-08HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1647h (NT): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 207-130 05/08/2019
2019-05-08HouseAmendment # 2019-1647h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/08/2019
2019-04-24HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1643h
2019-04-24HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1647h (NT) for 05/08/2019 (Vote 13-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 23 P. 15
2019-04-15HouseExecutive Session: 04/24/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211
2019-04-15HouseDivision III Work Session: 04/23/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211
2019-03-15HouseDivision III Work Session: 03/22/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 209
2019-03-04HousePublic Hearing: 03/11/2019 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211
2019-03-04HouseIntroduced 02/28/2019 and referred to Finance House Journal 7 P. 63
2019-02-14SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0316s, Regular Calendar 23Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 02/14/2019; Senate Journal 5
2019-02-14SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-0316s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/14/2019; Senate Journal 5
2019-02-06SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0316s, 02/14/2019; Senate Calendar 10
2019-01-31SenateHearing: 02/05/2019, Room 103, State House, 02:30 pm, on proposed amendment # 2019-0225s; Senate Calendar 9
2019-01-31SenateOught to Pass: Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 01/31/2019; Senate Journal 4
2019-01-23SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 01/31/2019; Senate Calendar 8
2019-01-17SenateHearing: 01/22/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 02:00 pm; Senate Calendar 7
2019-01-17SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=894&sy=2019&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB5
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2019&id=896&txtFormat=html
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2019&txtFormat=html&v=SA&id=896
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2019&txtFormat=html&v=HA&id=896
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=4&sy=2019&lb=S&eb=SB0005&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB5&ddlsponsors=&lsr=894
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=22&sy=2019&lb=S&eb=SB0005&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB5&ddlsponsors=&lsr=894
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=193&sy=2019&lb=H&eb=SB0005&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB5&ddlsponsors=&lsr=894

Bill Comments

feedback