NH SB505 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to residential child care licensing of child care institutions or agencies.
Title
Relative to residential child care licensing of child care institutions or agencies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-23 | House | Died on Table |
2020-06-30 | House | Vacated and Laid on Table Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 2 |
2020-02-03 | House | Introduced 01/09/2020 and referred to Children and Family Law House Journal 2 P. 59 |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 01/30/2020; Senate Journal 2 |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 01/30/2020; Senate Calendar 4 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 1 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Hearing: 01/14/2020, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 03:30 pm; Senate Calendar 2 |