NH SB509 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to complaint procedures in cases before the commission for human rights.
Title
Relative to complaint procedures in cases before the commission for human rights.
Sponsors
Sen. Melanie Levesque [D] | Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] | Sen. Thomas Sherman [D] | Sen. Martha Hennessey [D] |
Rep. Skip Cleaver [D] | Rep. Julie Radhakrishnan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Hearing: 03/10/2020, Room 100, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 10 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 1 |