NH SB512 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - Signed by the Governor on 06/25/2018; Chapter 0327; Effective 06/25/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - Signed by the Governor on 06/25/2018; Chapter 0327; Effective 06/25/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to compact sections of towns.
Title
Relative to compact sections of towns.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-29 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/25/2018; Chapter 0327; Effective 06/25/2018 |
2018-06-05 | House | Enrolled 05/23/2018 |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Conference Committee Report # 2018-2003c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/23/2018; Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-23 | House | Conference Committee Report 2003c: Adopted, Voice Vote 05/23/2018 |
2018-05-17 | House | Conference Committee Report # 2018-2003c Filed 05/17/2018; House Amendment + New Amendment |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Committee of Conference Meeting: 05/15/2018, 12:30 pm, Room 103, Legislative Office Building |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Conferee Change; Senator Gray Replaces Senator Gannon; Senate Journal 17 |
2018-05-10 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps. Steven Smith, T. Walsh, Sykes, True 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-10 | House | House Accedes to Senate Request for CofC (Rep. Steven Smith): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Gannon, Ward, Watters; 05/10/2018; Senate Journal 17 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Sen. Gannon Moved Nonconcur with the House Amendment; Requests C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/10/2018; Senate Journal 17 |
2018-05-03 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1699h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/03/2018 |
2018-05-03 | House | Amendment # 2018-1699h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/03/2018 |
2018-05-02 | House | Removed from Consent (Rep. Kurk) 05/02/2018 |
2018-04-25 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1699h for 05/02/2018 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 17 P. 9 |
2018-04-17 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 04/24/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 203 |
2018-04-11 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 04/17/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2018-03-21 | House | Public Hearing: 04/10/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2018-03-12 | House | Introduced 03/07/2018 and referred to Transportation House Journal 7 P. 52 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-0809s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/22/2018; Senate Journal 5 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Sen. Gray Floor Amendment # 2018-0809s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/22/2018; Senate Journal 5 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2018-0651s, Amendment Failed, Voice Vote; 02/22/2018; Senate Journal 5 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Sen. Gray Moved to Remove SB 512 from the Consent Calendar; 02/22/2018; Senate Journal 5 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0651s, 02/22/2018; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 8 |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Hearing: 01/31/2018, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 09:20 am; Senate Calendar 3 |
2017-12-20 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 1 |