NH SB513 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - Signed by the Governor on 06/25/2018; Chapter 0328; Effective 06/25/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - Signed by the Governor on 06/25/2018; Chapter 0328; Effective 06/25/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing September as New Hampshire recovery month.
Title
Establishing September as New Hampshire recovery month.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-15 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-29 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/25/2018; Chapter 0328; Effective 06/25/2018 |
2018-06-05 | House | Enrolled 05/23/2018 |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-1940e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/10/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-22 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-1940e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-02 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2018 |
2018-04-25 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 18-1; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 17 P. 17 |
2018-04-25 | House | Executive Session: 04/24/2018 Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-03-27 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 04/10/2018 01:15 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-03-20 | House | ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 04/05/2018 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-03-12 | House | Introduced 03/07/2018 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 7 P. 52 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/15/2018; Senate Journal 4 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 02/15/2018; Senate Journal 4 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved Reconsideration on the vote of Ought to Pass, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/15/2018; Senate Journal 4 |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/15/2018; Senate Calendar 7 |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Hearing: 01/31/2018, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 3 |
2017-12-20 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 1 |