NH SB517 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the public information and permitting functions of the office of the commissioner in the department of environmental services.
Title
Relative to the public information and permitting functions of the office of the commissioner in the department of environmental services.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] | Sen. Bob Giuda [R] | Rep. Suzanne Smith [D] |
Rep. Andrew Renzullo [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-23 | House | Died on Table |
2020-06-30 | House | Vacated and Laid on Table Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 3 |
2020-03-02 | House | Introduced 02/20/2020 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 5 P. 56 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-0292s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/06/2020; Senate Journal 3 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2020-0292s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/06/2020; Senate Journal 3 |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0292s, 02/06/2020; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 5 |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Hearing: 01/21/2020, Room 103, State House, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 3 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 1 |