NH SB521 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study and make recommendations for changes to RSA 14-B and RSA 14-C and the ethics guidelines governing conflicts of interest by members of the general court.
Title
Establishing a committee to study and make recommendations for changes to RSA 14-B and RSA 14-C and the ethics guidelines governing conflicts of interest by members of the general court.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Sen. Ruth Ward [R] | Sen. Harold French [R] | Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] |
Sen. Bob Giuda [R] | Sen. Regina Birdsell [R] | Sen. David Starr [R] | Sen. Charles Morse [R] |
Sen. Sharon Carson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-23 | House | Died on Table |
2020-06-30 | House | Introduced and Laid on Table Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 5 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-1105s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/11/2020; Senate Journal 6 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2020-1105s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/11/2020; Senate Journal 6 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-1105s, 03/11/2020; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 10 |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Hearing: 02/19/2020, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 6 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 1 |