NH SB523 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 03/05/2020; Senate Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 03/05/2020; Senate Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the analysis of devices or instruments that produce evidence that may be admissible in court.
Title
Relative to the analysis of devices or instruments that produce evidence that may be admissible in court.
Sponsors
Sen. Harold French [R] | Sen. Ruth Ward [R] | Sen. John Reagan [R] | Sen. Bob Giuda [R] |
Sen. Howard Pearl [R] | Rep. Glen Aldrich [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 03/05/2020; Senate Journal 5 |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 03/05/2020; Senate Calendar 9 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Hearing: 02/11/2020, Room 100, State House, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 6 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 1 |