NH SB526 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-22 - Pending Motion Inexpedient to Legislate; 03/22/2018; Senate Journal 10
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-22 - Pending Motion Inexpedient to Legislate; 03/22/2018; Senate Journal 10
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to school food and nutrition programs.
Title
Relative to school food and nutrition programs.
Sponsors
Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] | Sen. Dan Feltes [D] | Sen. Martha Hennessey [D] | Rep. Donald LeBrun [R] |
Rep. Mary Wallner [D] | Rep. Mary Gile [D] | Rep. Daniel Eaton [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-22 - Senate - Lay On Table (Y: 13 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 19 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 19 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | Senate | Pending Motion Inexpedient to Legislate; 03/22/2018; Senate Journal 10 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Sen. Giuda Moved Laid on Table, Regular Calendar 13Y-10N, Motion Adopted; 03/22/2018; Senate Journal 10 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 03/22/2018; |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Special Order to 03/22/2018, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/21/2018 Senate Journal 9 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 03/21/2018; Senate Calendar 13 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Special Order to the next session, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/15/2018; Senate Journal 8 |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 03/15/2018; Senate Calendar 12A |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendments 2018-0962s, and 2018-1028s, Regular Calendar 19Y-4N, Motion Adopted; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/08/2018; Senate Journal 6 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Sen. Fuller Clark Floor Amendment # 2018-1028s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/08/2018; Senate Journal 6 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2018-0962s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/08/2018; Senate Journal 6 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0962s, 03/08/2018; Senate Calendar 10A |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Hearing: 02/13/2018, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:25 am; Senate Calendar 6 |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 2 |