NH SB527 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - III. Remainder Effective 01/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - III. Remainder Effective 01/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to absentee voting and relative to the statewide centralized voter registration database.
Title
Relative to absentee voting and relative to the statewide centralized voter registration database.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-23 - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1999c (Y: 14 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - House - Adopt CofC (Y: 182 N: 159 NV: 25 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Senate - Nonconcur and Request a C of C (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - House - Adopt CofC (Y: 182 N: 159 NV: 25 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Senate - Nonconcur and Request a C of C (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-29 | Senate | III. Remainder Effective 01/01/2019 |
2018-06-29 | Senate | II. Sections 1 and 9 of this act shall take effect as provided in Section 10 |
2018-06-29 | Senate | I. Section 8 Effective 06/25/2018 |
2018-06-29 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/25/2018; Chapter 0329 |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-06-11 | House | Enrolled 05/23/2018 |
2018-06-06 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-2110e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-06-05 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-2110e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2018 |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Conference Committee Report # 2018-1999c; Regular Calendar 14Y-9N, Adopted; 05/23/2018; Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Sen. Avard moved to call the question, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/23/2018; Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-23 | House | Conference Committee Report 1999c: Adopted, Regular Calendar 182-159 05/23/2018 |
2018-05-17 | House | Conference Committee Report # 2018-1999c Filed 05/17/2018; House Amendment + New Amendment |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Conferee Change; Senator Bradley Replaces Senator Woodburn; Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-16 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps. B. Griffin, Freeman, Hill, Silber 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-16 | House | House Accedes to Senate Request for CofC (Rep. B. Griffin): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | ==RECONVENE== Committee of Conference Meeting: 05/17/2018, 11:00 am, Room 103, State House |
2018-05-14 | House | Conferee Change: Rep. Negron Replaces Rep. Silber 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Committee of Conference Meeting: 05/15/2018, 11:30 am, Room 103, State House ==RECESSED== |
2018-05-10 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Birdsell, Gray, Woodburn; 05/10/2018; Senate Journal 17 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Sen. Gray Moved Nonconcur with the House Amendment; Requests C of C, Regular Calendar 13Y-9N, Motion Adopted; 05/10/2018; Senate Journal 17 |
2018-05-03 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1656h and 1800h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/03/2018 |
2018-05-03 | House | FLAM # 2018-1800h (NT) (Rep. Kurk): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/03/2018 |
2018-05-03 | House | Amendment # 2018-1656h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/03/2018 |
2018-05-02 | House | Removed from Consent (Rep. Kurk) 05/02/2018 |
2018-04-25 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1656h for 05/02/2018 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 17 P. 7 |
2018-04-19 | House | Executive Session: 04/19/2018 Legislative Office Building 308 |
2018-04-11 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 04/19/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 308 |
2018-04-05 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 04/11/2018 12:30 PM Legislative Office Building 308 |
2018-03-21 | House | Public Hearing: 03/29/2018 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 305-307 |
2018-03-12 | House | Introduced 03/07/2018 and referred to Election Law House Journal 7 P. 53 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-0717s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/08/2018; Senate Journal 6 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2018-0717s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/08/2018; Senate Journal 6 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0717s, 03/08/2018; Senate Calendar 9 |
2018-01-16 | Senate | ==RECONVENE== Hearing: 01/23/2018, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 4 |
2018-01-10 | Senate | ==RECESSED== Hearing: 01/16/2018, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 3 |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Election Law and Internal Affairs; Senate Journal 2 |