NH SB528 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study charitable gaming.
Title
Establishing a committee to study charitable gaming.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-23 | House | Died on Table |
2020-06-30 | House | Vacated and Laid on Table Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 5 |
2020-03-02 | House | Introduced 02/20/2020 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 5 P. 56 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-0520s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/13/2020; Senate Journal 4 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2020-0520s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/13/2020; Senate Journal 4 |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0520s, 02/13/2020; Senate Calendar 6 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 1 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Hearing: 01/15/2020, Room 100, State House, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 2 |