NH SB529 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 17-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-05 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/05/2018 House Journal 11 P. 16
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-05 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/05/2018 House Journal 11 P. 16
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the department of environmental services to conduct a study regarding the Baker River in the town of Warren and making an appropriation for such study.
Title
Requiring the department of environmental services to conduct a study regarding the Baker River in the town of Warren and making an appropriation for such study.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-05 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/05/2018 House Journal 11 P. 16 |
2018-03-29 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2018-03-29 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 04/05/2018 (Vote 11-6; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 8 |
2018-03-29 | House | Executive Session: 03/27/2018 Legislative Office Building 305 |
2018-03-21 | House | Public Hearing: 03/27/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2018-03-20 | House | Introduced 03/15/2018 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development House Journal 8 P. 70 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/15/2018; Senate Journal 8 |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/15/2018; Senate Calendar 12A |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-0391s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 02/15/2018; Senate Journal 4 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2018-0391s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/15/2018; Senate Journal 4 |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0391s, 02/15/2018; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 7 |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Hearing: 01/30/2018, Room 103, State House, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 4 |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 2 |