NH SB531 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - Signed by the Governor on 06/25/2018; Chapter 0330; Effective 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - Signed by the Governor on 06/25/2018; Chapter 0330; Effective 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the office of professional licensure and certification.
Title
Relative to the office of professional licensure and certification.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-29 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/25/2018; Chapter 0330; Effective 07/01/2018 |
2018-06-05 | House | Enrolled 05/23/2018 |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Conference Committee Report # 2018-2033c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/23/2018; Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-23 | House | Conference Committee Report 2033c: Adopted, Voice Vote 05/23/2018 |
2018-05-17 | House | Conference Committee Report # 2018-2033c Filed 05/17/2018; As Amended by the House |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Committee of Conference Meeting: 05/16/2018, 09:45 am, Room 103, State House |
2018-05-10 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps. Hansen, P. Schmidt, H. Marsh, L. Ober 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-10 | House | House Accedes to Senate Request for CofC (Reps. McGuire, Kurk): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Reagan, Carson, Soucy; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Sen. Carson Moved Nonconcur with the House Amendment; Requests C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15 |
2018-04-26 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1591h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/26/2018 |
2018-04-26 | House | Amendment # 2018-1591h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/26/2018 |
2018-04-19 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1591h for 04/26/2018 (Vote 26-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 5 |
2018-04-12 | House | Division I Work Session: 04/17/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 212 |
2018-04-12 | House | Executive Session: 04/18/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2018-04-12 | House | Referred to Finance 04/12/2018 House Journal 12 P. 5 |
2018-04-12 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1272h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/12/2018 House Journal 12 P. 4 |
2018-04-12 | House | Amendment # 2018-1272h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/12/2018 House Journal 12 P. 4 |
2018-04-04 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1272h for 04/12/2018 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 4 |
2018-03-28 | House | Executive Session: 04/03/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-03-28 | House | ==ROOM CHANGE== Subcommittee Work Session: 03/29/2018 09:40 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2018-03-20 | House | ==ROOM CHANGE== Subcommittee Work Session: 03/27/2018 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2018-03-14 | House | Public Hearing: 03/20/2018 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-03-12 | House | Introduced 03/07/2018 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 7 P. 52 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/15/2018; Senate Journal 4 |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/15/2018; Senate Calendar 7 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 02/01/2018; Senate Journal 3 |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/01/2018; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 5 |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Hearing: 01/24/2018, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:20 am; Senate Calendar 4 |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 2 |