NH SB538 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Passed on June 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-14 - Signed by the Governor on 06/08/2018; Chapter 0234; Effective 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Passed on June 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-14 - Signed by the Governor on 06/08/2018; Chapter 0234; Effective 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Including police officers of the state office complex police force in group II of the retirement system.
Title
Including police officers of the state office complex police force in group II of the retirement system.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-14 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/08/2018; Chapter 0234; Effective 07/01/2019 |
2018-05-15 | House | Enrolled 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/10/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-03 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/03/2018 |
2018-04-26 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 05/02/2018 (Vote 24-2; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 17 P. 21 |
2018-04-19 | House | Division I Work Session: 04/24/2018 10:45 am Legislative Office Building 212 |
2018-04-19 | House | Executive Session: 04/25/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2018-04-12 | House | Referred to Finance 04/12/2018 House Journal 12 P. 5 |
2018-04-12 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/12/2018 House Journal 12 P. 5 |
2018-04-04 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 04/12/2018 (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 4 |
2018-03-28 | House | Executive Session: 04/03/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-03-20 | House | Public Hearing: 03/29/2018 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-03-20 | House | Introduced 03/15/2018 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 8 P. 70 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/15/2018; Senate Journal 8 |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/15/2018; Senate Calendar 12A |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-0521s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 02/15/2018; Senate Journal 4 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2018-0521s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/15/2018; Senate Journal 4 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0521s, 02/15/2018; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 7 |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Hearing: 01/31/2018, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 5 |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 2 |