NH SB541 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on July 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-13 - Signed by the Governor on 07/10/2018; Chapter 0369; Effective 07/10/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on July 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-13 - Signed by the Governor on 07/10/2018; Chapter 0369; Effective 07/10/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the presumption under workers' compensation requiring the reimbursement of costs associated with firefighters who have cancer.
Title
Relative to the presumption under workers' compensation requiring the reimbursement of costs associated with firefighters who have cancer.
Sponsors
Sen. Daniel Innis [R] | Sen. William Gannon [R] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Sen. Donna Soucy [D] |
Rep. David Danielson [R] | Rep. Tracy Emerick [R] | Rep. Kate Murray [D] | Rep. Tamara Le [D] |
Rep. Robert Nigrello [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-22 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Sen. Bradley Floor Amendment 1188s (Y: 12 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Sen. Bradley Floor Amendment 1188s (Y: 12 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-13 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/10/2018; Chapter 0369; Effective 07/10/2018 |
2018-06-05 | House | Enrolled 05/23/2018 |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Conference Committee Report # 2018-2056c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/23/2018; Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-23 | House | Conference Committee Report 2056c: Adopted, Voice Vote 05/23/2018 |
2018-05-17 | House | Conference Committee Report # 2018-2056c Filed 05/17/2018; House Amendment + New Amendment |
2018-05-16 | Senate | ==RECONVENE== Committee of Conference Meeting: 05/16/2018, 12:00 pm, Room 100, State House |
2018-05-15 | Senate | ==RECONVENE== Committee of Conference Meeting: 05/16/2018, 08:30 am, Room 100, State House ==RECESSED== |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Committee of Conference Meeting: 05/15/2018, 12:30 pm, Room 103, State House ==RECESSED== |
2018-05-10 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps. L. Ober, Emerick, Spanos, Leishman 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-10 | House | House Accedes to Senate Request for CofC (Rep. Kurk): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Daniels, Giuda, D'Allesandro; 05/10/2018; Senate Journal 17 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Sen. Daniels Moved Nonconcur with the House Amendment; Requests C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/10/2018; Senate Journal 17 |
2018-05-02 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1683h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2018 |
2018-05-02 | House | Amendment # 2018-1683h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2018 |
2018-04-25 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1683h (NT) for 05/02/2018 (Vote 26-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 17 P. 7 |
2018-04-19 | House | Division I Work Session: 04/24/2018 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 212 |
2018-04-19 | House | Executive Session: 04/25/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2018-04-12 | House | Division I Work Session: 04/17/2018 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 212 |
2018-04-05 | House | Division I Work Session: 04/10/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 212 |
2018-03-29 | House | Public Hearing: 04/03/2018 04:00 PM Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2018-03-27 | House | Introduced 03/22/2018 and referred to Finance House Journal 10 P. 53 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-1188s, Regular Calendar 23Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/22/2018; Senate Journal 10 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Floor Amendment # 2018-1188s, Regular Calendar 12Y-11N, Amendment Adopted; 03/22/2018; Senate Journal 10 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2018-1156s, Amendment Failed, Voice Vote; 03/22/2018; Senate Journal 10 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Special Order to the present time, Without Objection, Motion Adopted Senate Journal 10 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Special Order to to after the addendum, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/22/2018; Senate Journal 10 |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1156s, 03/22/2018; Senate Calendar 13A |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Hearing: 01/23/2018, Room 103, State House, 01:10 pm; Senate Calendar 4 |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Finance; Senate Journal 2 |