NH SB548 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/26/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/26/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to therapeutic intervention needs of infants diagnosed with neonatal abstinence syndrome.
Title
Relative to therapeutic intervention needs of infants diagnosed with neonatal abstinence syndrome.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/26/2018 |
2018-04-18 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 04/26/2018 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 6 |
2018-04-11 | House | Executive Session: 04/17/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2018-04-03 | House | ==ROOM CHANGE== Public Hearing: 04/11/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 206 |
2018-03-27 | House | Introduced 03/22/2018 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 10 P. 53 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-1132s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/22/2018; Senate Journal 10 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Floor Amendment # 2018-1132s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/22/2018; Senate Journal 10 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved Ought to Pass; 03/22/2018; Senate Journal 10 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Failed, Voice Vote; 03/22/2018; Senate Journal 10 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 03/22/2018; |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Special Order to 03/22/2018, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/21/2018 Senate Journal 9 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 03/21/2018; Senate Calendar 13 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Special Order to the next session, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/15/2018; Senate Journal 8 |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 03/15/2018; Senate Calendar 12A |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-0987s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/08/2018; Senate Journal 6 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2018-0987s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/08/2018; Senate Journal 6 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0987s, 03/08/2018; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 10A |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Hearing: 01/23/2018, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 4 |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 2 |