NH SB552 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-15 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/15/2018; Senate Journal 4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-15 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/15/2018; Senate Journal 4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to transportation of trauma victims by first responders.
Title
Relative to transportation of trauma victims by first responders.
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Giuda [R] | Sen. John Reagan [R] | Sen. Daniel Innis [R] | Rep. Neal Kurk [R] |
Rep. Kenneth Weyler [R] | Rep. Richard Hinch [R] | Rep. Frank Kotowski [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/15/2018; Senate Journal 4 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 02/15/2018; Senate Calendar 7 |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Hearing: 01/18/2018, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 02:00 pm; Senate Calendar 3 |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 2 |