NH SB555 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to telemedicine coverage and reimbursements.
Title
Relative to telemedicine coverage and reimbursements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-23 | House | Died on Table |
2020-06-30 | House | Vacated and Laid on Table Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 2 |
2020-06-03 | House | Introduced 03/12/2020 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 8 P. 227 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/05/2020; Senate Journal 5 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/05/2020; Senate Calendar 9 |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Hearing: 02/04/2020, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 5 |
2020-01-02 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 1 |