NH SB556 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to violence in schools.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to violence in schools.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-23HouseDied on Table
2020-06-30HouseVacated and Laid on Table Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 3
2020-06-03HouseIntroduced 03/12/2020 and referred to Education House Journal 8 P. 227
2020-03-05SenateCommittee Amendment # 2020-0913s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/05/2020; Senate Journal 5
2020-03-05SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2020-0913s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/05/2020; Senate Journal 5
2020-02-27SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0913s, 03/05/2020; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 9
2020-01-29SenateHearing: 02/04/2020, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:45 pm; Senate Calendar 5
2020-01-02SenateTo Be Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 1

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback