NH SB557 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-20 - Executive Session: 10/25/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building210-211
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-20 - Executive Session: 10/25/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building210-211
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a board of housing development appeals.
Title
Establishing a board of housing development appeals.
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Giuda [R] | Sen. Dan Feltes [D] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Sen. David Watters [D] |
Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Sen. Jeff Woodburn [D] | Rep. Edward Butler [D] | Rep. Richard Hinch [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-20 | House | Executive Session: 10/25/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building210-211 |
2018-09-05 | House | Division I Interim Study Work Session: 09/18/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 212 |
2018-04-26 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted DV 223-91 04/26/2018 |
2018-04-26 | House | Lay SB 557 on Table (Rep. Janvrin): Motion Failed DV 40-274 04/26/2018 |
2018-04-19 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 04/26/2018 (Vote 16-10; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 12 |
2018-04-17 | House | ==CONTINUED== Division I Work Session: 04/17/2018 02:05 PM Legislative Office Building 212 |
2018-04-12 | House | ==RECESSED== Division I Work Session: 04/17/2018 11:35 am Legislative Office Building 212 |
2018-04-12 | House | Executive Session: 04/18/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2018-04-12 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 04/17/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2018-04-05 | House | Vacated and Referred to Finance (Rep. Hagan): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/05/2018 House Journal 11 P. 2 |
2018-03-21 | House | ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 04/03/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 208 |
2018-03-20 | House | Introduced 03/15/2018 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 8 P. 71 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/15/2018; Senate Journal 8 |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/15/2018; Senate Calendar 12A |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-0967s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/08/2018; Senate Journal 6 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2018-0967s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/08/2018; Senate Journal 6 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0967s, 03/08/2018; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 10A |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Hearing: 01/23/2018, Room 100, State House, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 4 |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 2 |