NH SB557 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Vacated and Laid on Table Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/30/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the advisory council on career and technical education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the advisory council on career and technical education.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-30HouseVacated and Laid on Table Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/30/2020
2020-03-11House==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 03/17/2020 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 207
2020-02-03HouseIntroduced 01/09/2020 and referred to Education House Journal 2 P. 59
2020-01-30SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2020-0074s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 01/30/2020; Senate Journal 2
2020-01-30SenateCommittee Amendment # 2020-0074s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/30/2020; Senate Journal 2
2020-01-16SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0074s, 01/30/2020; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 4
2020-01-08SenateHearing: 01/14/2020, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 10:15 am; Senate Calendar 2
2020-01-02SenateIntroduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Education and Workforce Development; Senate Journal 1

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback