NH SB560 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-12 - Executive Session: 10/03/2018 10:30 am Legislative Office Building305
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-12 - Executive Session: 10/03/2018 10:30 am Legislative Office Building305
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to updating the state trails plan and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Relative to updating the state trails plan and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-12 | House | Executive Session: 10/03/2018 10:30 am Legislative Office Building305 |
2018-04-05 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/05/2018 House Journal 11 P. 7 |
2018-03-29 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 04/05/2018 (Vote 15-2; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 6 |
2018-03-29 | House | Executive Session: 03/27/2018 Legislative Office Building 305 |
2018-03-21 | House | Public Hearing: 03/27/2018 11:20 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2018-03-20 | House | Introduced 03/15/2018 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development House Journal 8 P. 71 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-1071s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/15/2018; Senate Journal 8 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2018-1071s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/15/2018; Senate Journal 8 |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1071s, 03/15/2018; Senate Calendar 12A |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-0623s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 02/22/2018; Senate Journal 5 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2018-0623s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/22/2018; Senate Journal 5 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0623s, 02/22/2018; Senate Calendar 8 |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Hearing: 01/23/2018, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 01:40 pm; Senate Calendar 4 |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 2 |