NH SB569 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-5)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Conference Committee Report: Not Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to animal cruelty and establishing a commission to study cost of care for confiscated animals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to animal cruelty and establishing a commission to study cost of care for confiscated animals.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-02 - Senate - OTPA (Y: 222 N: 111 NV: 33 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Adopt Amendment (Y: 205 N: 125 NV: 36 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 19 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-17HouseConference Committee Report: Not Filed
2018-05-16Senate==RECONVENE== Committee of Conference Meeting: 05/16/2018, 10:05 am, Room 100, State House
2018-05-16HouseSpeaker Appoints: Reps. John T. O'Connor, Darrow, Pearl, Bixby 05/10/2018
2018-05-16HouseHouse Accedes to Senate Request for CofC (Rep. John T. O'Connor): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/10/2018
2018-05-14Senate==RECONVENE== Committee of Conference Meeting: 05/15/2018, 03:00 pm, Room 102, Legislative Office Building ==RECESSED==
2018-05-14SenateCommittee of Conference Meeting: 05/14/2018, 09:00 am, Room 100, State House ==RECESSED==
2018-05-10SenatePresident Appoints: Senators Bradley, Avard, Fuller Clark; 05/10/2018; Senate Journal 17
2018-05-10SenateSen. Avard Moved Nonconcur with the House Amendment; Requests C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/10/2018; Senate Journal 17
2018-05-02HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 1709h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 222-111 05/02/2018
2018-05-02HouseAmendment # 2018-1709h: Amendment Adopted Regular Calendar 205-125 05/02/2018
2018-04-25HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2018-04-25HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1709h (NT) for 05/02/2018 (Vote 15-1; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 17 P. 14
2018-04-24HouseExecutive Session: 04/24/2018 Legislative Office Building 303
2018-04-19House==CANCELLED== Full Committee Work Session: 04/25/2018 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 303
2018-04-19HouseFull Committee Work Session: 04/24/2018 08:30 am Legislative Office Building 303
2018-04-12HouseFull Committee Work Session: 04/18/2018 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 303
2018-04-12HouseFull Committee Work Session: 04/17/2018 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 303
2018-04-09HouseFull Committee Work Session: 04/11/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 201-203
2018-04-05House==CONTINUED== Public Hearing: 04/11/2018 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 201-203
2018-03-28House==RECESSED== Public Hearing: 04/04/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301-303
2018-03-27HouseIntroduced 03/22/2018 and referred to Environment and Agriculture House Journal 10 P. 53
2018-03-22SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2018-1157s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/22/2018; Senate Journal 10
2018-03-22SenateCommittee Amendment # 2018-1157s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/22/2018; Senate Journal 10
2018-03-20SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1157s, 03/22/2018; Senate Calendar 13A
2018-03-08SenateOught to Pass with Amendments 2018-0720s, 2018-1020s, and 2018-0938s, Regular Calendar 19Y-5N, Motion Adopted; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/08/2018; Senate Journal 6
2018-03-08SenateSen. Bradley Floor Amendment # 2018-0938s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/08/2018; Senate Journal 6
2018-03-08SenateSen. Birdsell Floor Amendment # 2018-1020s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/08/2018; Senate Journal 6
2018-03-08SenateCommittee Amendment # 2018-0720s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/08/2018; Senate Journal 6
2018-02-22SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0720s, 03/08/2018; Senate Calendar 9
2018-02-12Senate==RECONVENE== Hearing: 02/13/2018, Room 103, State House, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 7
2018-01-26SenateHearing: ===RECESSED=== 02/06/2018, Room 103, State House, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 5A
2018-01-11SenateIntroduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 2

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2862&sy=2018&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=SB569
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2018&id=1878&txtFormat=html
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2018&txtFormat=html&v=SA&id=1878
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2018&txtFormat=html&v=SA2&id=1878
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2018&txtFormat=html&v=HA&id=1878
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=67&sy=2018&lb=S&eb=SB0569&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=SB569&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2862
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=203&sy=2018&lb=H&eb=SB0569&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=SB569&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2862
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=204&sy=2018&lb=H&eb=SB0569&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=SB569&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2862

Bill Comments

feedback