NH SB570 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - Signed by the Governor on 06/25/2018; Chapter 0334; Effective 06/30/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - Signed by the Governor on 06/25/2018; Chapter 0334; Effective 06/30/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the work requirement for the child care scholarship program.
Title
Relative to the work requirement for the child care scholarship program.
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Feltes [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-08 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-29 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/25/2018; Chapter 0334; Effective 06/30/2018 |
2018-06-05 | House | Enrolled 05/23/2018 |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-2081e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-24 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-2081e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2018 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Sen. Carson Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/10/2018; Senate Journal 17 |
2018-05-02 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1461h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2018 |
2018-05-02 | House | Amendment # 2018-1461h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2018 |
2018-04-26 | House | Minority Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study |
2018-04-26 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1461h for 05/02/2018 (Vote 11-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 17 P. 18 |
2018-04-25 | House | Executive Session: 04/24/2018 Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-03-27 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 04/10/2018 02:15 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-03-20 | House | ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 04/05/2018 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-03-12 | House | Introduced 03/07/2018 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 7 P. 54 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/08/2018; Senate Journal 6 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/08/2018; Senate Calendar 9 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Special Order to the next session, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 02/22/2018; Senate Journal 5 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/22/2018; Senate Calendar 8 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Special Order to 02/22/2018, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 02/15/2018 Senate Journal 4 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/15/2018; Senate Calendar 7 |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Hearing: 01/31/2018, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 10:15 am; Senate Calendar 5 |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 2 |