NH SB578 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on June 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - Signed by the Governor on 06/25/2018; Chapter 0335; Effective 06/25/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on June 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - Signed by the Governor on 06/25/2018; Chapter 0335; Effective 06/25/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to unclassified positions within the department of health and human services.
Title
Relative to unclassified positions within the department of health and human services.
Sponsors
Sen. John Reagan [R] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Sen. William Gannon [R] | Sen. Donna Soucy [D] |
Rep. Carol McGuire [R] | Rep. Frank Byron [R] | Rep. John Sytek [R] | Rep. Peter Schmidt [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-29 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/25/2018; Chapter 0335; Effective 06/25/2018 |
2018-06-05 | House | Enrolled 05/23/2018 |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-2084e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-24 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-2084e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2018 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Sen. Carson Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/10/2018; Senate Journal 17 |
2018-05-02 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1757h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2018 |
2018-05-02 | House | Amendment # 2018-1757h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2018 |
2018-04-26 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1757h for 05/02/2018 (Vote 26-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 17 P. 7 |
2018-04-19 | House | Division I Work Session: 04/24/2018 10:10 am Legislative Office Building 212 |
2018-04-19 | House | Executive Session: 04/25/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2018-04-19 | House | Public Hearing on non-germane Amendment # 2018-1647h: 04/24/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 212 |
2018-04-12 | House | Referred to Finance 04/12/2018 House Journal 12 P. 5 |
2018-04-12 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/12/2018 House Journal 12 P. 5 |
2018-04-04 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 04/12/2018 (Vote 16-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 4 |
2018-03-28 | House | Executive Session: 04/03/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-03-20 | House | Public Hearing: 03/29/2018 02:30 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-03-20 | House | Introduced 03/15/2018 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 8 P. 71 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/15/2018; Senate Journal 8 |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/15/2018; Senate Calendar 12A |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 02/15/2018; Senate Journal 4 |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/15/2018; Senate Calendar 7 |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Hearing: 01/31/2018, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 10:35 am; Senate Calendar 5 |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 2 |