NH SB581 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-13 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 02/13/2020; Senate Journal 4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-13 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 02/13/2020; Senate Journal 4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amending the eligibility criteria for obtaining a part-time commercial lobster and crab license.
Title
Amending the eligibility criteria for obtaining a part-time commercial lobster and crab license.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 02/13/2020; Senate Journal 4 |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; 02/13/2020; Senate Calendar 6 |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Hearing: 02/04/2020, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 02:15 pm; Senate Calendar 5 |
2020-01-06 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 1 |