NH SB582 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Placed on Laid on Table Consent List and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Placed on Laid on Table Consent List and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a commission to differentiate the cost of education and the cost of care for children in a residential facility.
Title
Establishing a commission to differentiate the cost of education and the cost of care for children in a residential facility.
Sponsors
Sen. Ruth Ward [R] | Rep. Jon Morgan [D] | Sen. Bob Giuda [R] | Rep. Roderick Ladd [R] |
Rep. Glenn Cordelli [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Placed on Laid on Table Consent List and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-1168s; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 11 |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Hearing: 02/04/2020, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 10:15 am; Senate Calendar 5 |
2020-01-06 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Education and Workforce Development; Senate Journal 1 |