NH SB588 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-18 - II. Remainder shall take effect 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-18 - II. Remainder shall take effect 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to inspections of laboratories and relative to loans for lead hazard remediation projects.
Title
Relative to inspections of laboratories and relative to loans for lead hazard remediation projects.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-18 | Senate | II. Remainder shall take effect 07/01/2018 |
2018-06-18 | Senate | I. Section 2 Effective 06/12/2018 |
2018-06-18 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/12/2018; Chapter 0264 |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-29 | House | Enrolled 05/23/2018 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Sen. Carson Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/10/2018; Senate Journal 17 |
2018-05-02 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1561h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2018 |
2018-05-02 | House | Amendment # 2018-1561h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2018 |
2018-04-26 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1561h for 05/02/2018 (Vote 24-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 17 P. 8 |
2018-04-19 | House | Executive Session: 04/25/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2018-04-16 | House | Division III Work Session: 04/17/2018 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2018-04-12 | House | Referred to Finance 04/12/2018 House Journal 12 P. 5 |
2018-04-12 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1286h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/12/2018 House Journal 12 P. 5 |
2018-04-12 | House | Amendment # 2018-1286h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/12/2018 House Journal 12 P. 5 |
2018-04-04 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1286h for 04/12/2018 (Vote 15-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 4 |
2018-03-28 | House | Executive Session: 04/03/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-03-27 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 03/28/2018 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-03-14 | House | ==ROOM CHANGE== Public Hearing: 03/27/2018 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2018-03-12 | House | Introduced 03/07/2018 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 7 P. 54 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-0994s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/08/2018; Senate Journal 6 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2018-0994s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/08/2018; Senate Journal 6 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0994s, 03/08/2018; Senate Calendar 10A |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Hearing: 02/21/2018, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:30 am, on proposed amendment # 2018-0593s; Senate Calendar 8 |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Hearing: 02/21/2018, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:20 am; Senate Calendar 8 |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Introduced 01/18/2018 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 3 |