NH SB590 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - II. Remainder Effective 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - II. Remainder Effective 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the state loan repayment program, the developmental disabilities wait list, involuntary admissions procedures, and the mental health system.
Title
Relative to the state loan repayment program, the developmental disabilities wait list, involuntary admissions procedures, and the mental health system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-03 - House - OTPA (Y: 315 N: 14 NV: 32 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Sen. Fuller Clark Floor Amendment 1197s (Y: 9 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Committee Amendment 0991 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Sen. Fuller Clark Floor Amendment 1197s (Y: 9 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Committee Amendment 0991 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-10 | Senate | II. Remainder Effective 07/01/2018 |
2018-07-10 | Senate | I. Section 1 & 15 shall not take effect |
2018-07-10 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/28/2018; Chapter 0343 |
2018-06-05 | House | Enrolled 05/23/2018 |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-2098e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-29 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-2098e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2018 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/10/2018; Senate Journal 17 |
2018-05-03 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1705h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 315-14 05/03/2018 |
2018-05-03 | House | Amendment # 2018-1705h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/03/2018 |
2018-04-26 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1705h (NT) for 05/02/2018 (Vote 22-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 17 P. 22 |
2018-04-19 | House | Division III Work Session: 04/20/2018 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2018-04-19 | House | Executive Session: 04/25/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2018-04-18 | House | Division III Work Session: 04/24/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2018-04-12 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 04/18/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2018-04-12 | House | Public Hearing on non-germane Amendment # 2018-1487h: 04/17/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2018-04-12 | House | Division III Work Session: 04/16/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2018-04-05 | House | Division III Work Session: 04/10/2018 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2018-04-05 | House | Division III Work Session: 04/09/2018 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2018-03-29 | House | Public Hearing: 04/03/2018 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2018-03-27 | House | Introduced 03/22/2018 and referred to Finance House Journal 10 P. 53 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 23Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/22/2018; Senate Journal 10 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Without Objection, Sen. Birdsell Moved the Question, Motion Adopted; 03/22/2018; Senate Journal 10 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Sen. Fuller Clark Floor Amendment # 2018-1197s, Regular Calendar 9Y-14N, Amendment Failed; 03/22/2018; Senate Journal 10 |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/22/2018; Senate Calendar 13A |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendments 2018-0991s, and 2018-1061s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/14/2018; Senate Journal 7 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Sen. Reagan Floor Amendment # 2018-1061s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/14/2018; Senate Journal 7 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2018-0991s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Amendment Adopted; 03/14/2018; Senate Journal 7 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0991s, 03/14/2018; Senate Calendar 11 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Special Order to the next session, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/08/2018; Senate Journal 6 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0991s, 03/08/2018; Senate Calendar 10A |
2018-02-01 | Senate | ===ROOM CHANGE=== Hearing: 02/08/2018, Room 100, State House, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 6 |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Introduced 01/18/2018 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 3 |