NH SB593 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/05/2020; Senate Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/05/2020; Senate Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to prohibiting unlicensed persons from using titles or descriptions of services for the practice of medicine.
Title
Relative to prohibiting unlicensed persons from using titles or descriptions of services for the practice of medicine.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/05/2020; Senate Journal 5 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 03/05/2020; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 9 |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Hearing: 02/19/2020, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 6 |
2020-01-06 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 1 |