NH SB599 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to testing for lead in water in schools and child care facilities.
Title
Relative to testing for lead in water in schools and child care facilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | ==TIME CHANGE== Hearing: 03/03/2020, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 02:00 pm; Senate Calendar 9 |
2020-01-06 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 1 |