NH SB600 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring medication-assisted treatment for substance use disorders for prisoners incarcerated in a county correctional facility.
Title
Requiring medication-assisted treatment for substance use disorders for prisoners incarcerated in a county correctional facility.
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Sherman [D] | Sen. Dan Feltes [D] | Rep. Jon Morgan [D] | Rep. Charles McMahon [R] |
Rep. William Marsh [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-23 | House | Died on Table |
2020-06-30 | House | Vacated and Laid on Table Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 2 |
2020-06-03 | House | Introduced 03/12/2020 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 8 P. 227 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2020-0770s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/05/2020; Senate Journal 5 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-0770s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/05/2020; Senate Journal 5 |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0770s, 03/05/2020; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 9 |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Hearing: 02/04/2020, Room 100, State House, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 5 |
2020-01-06 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 1 |