NH SB608 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to animals in motor vehicles.
Title
Relative to animals in motor vehicles.
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Sherman [D] | Sen. David Watters [D] | Sen. Kevin Cavanaugh [D] | Rep. Tamara Le [D] |
Rep. Peter Leishman [D] | Rep. Kate Murray [D] | Rep. Jaci Grote [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Hearing: 02/20/2020, Room 100, State House, 10:40 am; Senate Calendar 7 |
2020-01-06 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 2 |