NH SB609 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Pending Motion Ought to Pass; 03/05/2020; Senate Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Pending Motion Ought to Pass; 03/05/2020; Senate Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to passenger restraints.
Title
Relative to passenger restraints.
Sponsors
Sen. David Watters [D] | Sen. Thomas Sherman [D] | Sen. Cindy Rosenwald [D] | Sen. Martha Hennessey [D] |
Rep. William Marsh [D] | Rep. Polly Campion [D] | Rep. Skip Berrien [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | Senate | Pending Motion Ought to Pass; 03/05/2020; Senate Journal 5 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Sen. D'Allesandro Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/05/2020; Senate Journal 5 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/05/2020; Senate Calendar 9 |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Hearing: 02/04/2020, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 4 |
2020-01-06 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 1 |