NH SB61 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Rereferred to Committee, Regular Calendar 15Y-9N, Motion Adopted; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Permitting private enforcement of the rights of construction and labor industry employees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permitting private enforcement of the rights of construction and labor industry employees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-28 - Senate - Rereferred (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28SenateRereferred to Committee, Regular Calendar 15Y-9N, Motion Adopted; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11
2019-03-19SenateCommittee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/28/2019; Senate Calendar 15
2019-03-14SenateHearing: 03/19/2019, Room 100, State House, 01:15 pm; Senate Calendar 14
2019-01-17SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback