NH SB62 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on July 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-16 - Signed by the Governor on 07/12/2019; Chapter 227; Effective 07/12/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on July 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-16 - Signed by the Governor on 07/12/2019; Chapter 227; Effective 07/12/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to temporary layoffs of certain seasonal workers and establishing a commission to study school bus driver background checks.
Title
Relative to temporary layoffs of certain seasonal workers and establishing a commission to study school bus driver background checks.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-16 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/12/2019; Chapter 227; Effective 07/12/2019 |
2019-06-28 | House | Enrolled 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 53 |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2463e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/06/2019); Senate Journal 20 |
2019-06-12 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2463e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/06/2019 House Journal 18 P. 43 |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2402e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/06/2019); Senate Journal 20 |
2019-05-31 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2402e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2019 House Journal 16 P. 51 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-1884e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/15/2019); Senate Journal 17 |
2019-05-14 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-1884e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 100 |
2019-05-02 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2019 House Journal 14 P. 7 |
2019-04-18 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 05/02/2019 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 22 P. 6 |
2019-04-10 | House | Executive Session: 04/17/2019 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 307 |
2019-04-03 | House | Public Hearing: 04/10/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 307 |
2019-03-21 | House | Introduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services House Journal 11 P. 69 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0584s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2019-0584s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0584s, 03/07/2019; Senate Calendar 12 |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Hearing: 02/12/2019, Room 100, State House, 01:15 pm; Senate Calendar 10 |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 4 |