NH SB63 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-09-12 - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/01/2019 09:45 am Legislative Office Building 302
Hearing: Oct 23 @ 12:30 pm in Legislative Office Building 302
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to sharing of insurer rebates with enrollees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to sharing of insurer rebates with enrollees.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-12HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 10/01/2019 09:45 am Legislative Office Building 302
2019-09-11HouseExecutive Session: 10/23/2019 12:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302
2019-08-29HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 09/10/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302
2019-06-17HouseFull Committee Work Session: 06/25/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302
2019-05-29HouseRetained in Committee
2019-05-08HouseExecutive Session: 05/21/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 302
2019-05-08HouseFull Committee Work Session: 05/16/2019 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 302
2019-04-09HousePublic Hearing: 04/24/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302
2019-03-28HouseIntroduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 11 P. 72
2019-03-21SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1209s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/21/2019; Senate Journal 9
2019-03-21SenateSen. Bradley Floor Amendment # 2019-1209s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/21/2019; Senate Journal 9
2019-03-12SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/21/2019; Senate Calendar 14
2019-02-13SenateHearing: 02/19/2019, Room 100, State House, 02:15 pm; Senate Calendar 11
2019-01-17SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback