NH SB636 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing the commissioner of safety to appoint security officers at department facilities.
Title
Authorizing the commissioner of safety to appoint security officers at department facilities.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Sen. Lou D'Allesandro [D] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Rep. Kenneth Weyler [R] |
Sen. Erin Hennessey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-23 | House | Died on Table |
2020-06-30 | House | Vacated and Laid on Table Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 2 |
2020-06-03 | House | Introduced 03/12/2020 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 8 P. 227 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2020-0627s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/05/2020; Senate Journal 5 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-0627s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/05/2020; Senate Journal 5 |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0627s, 03/05/2020; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 9 |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Hearing: 01/22/2020, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 3 |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 2 |