NH SB64 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by the Governor on 07/10/2019; Chapter 189; Effective 07/10/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by the Governor on 07/10/2019; Chapter 189; Effective 07/10/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to antifraud plans maintained by insurance companies.
Title
Relative to antifraud plans maintained by insurance companies.
Sponsors
Rep. Jon Morgan [D] | Sen. Donna Soucy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-15 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/10/2019; Chapter 189; Effective 07/10/2019 |
2019-06-18 | House | Enrolled 06/13/2019 House Journal 19 P. 18 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/13/2019); Senate Journal 21 |
2019-06-05 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/05/2019 House Journal 17 P. 3 |
2019-05-29 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 06/05/2019 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 27 P. 6 |
2019-05-08 | House | Executive Session: 05/21/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-05-01 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 05/07/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-04-10 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 04/17/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-04-09 | House | Public Hearing: 04/16/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-03-28 | House | Introduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 11 P. 72 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/21/2019; Senate Journal 9 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/21/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 14 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Hearing: 03/05/2019, Room 100, State House, 02:30 pm; Senate Calendar 12 |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 4 |