NH SB65 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB65
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - Pending Motion Inexpedient to Legislate; 01/08/2020; Senate Journal 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - Pending Motion Inexpedient to Legislate; 01/08/2020; Senate Journal 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the start of the school year.
Title
Relative to the start of the school year.
Sponsors
Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] | Sen. Thomas Sherman [D] | Sen. Martha Hennessey [D] | Sen. Kevin Cavanaugh [D] |
Rep. Laura Pantelakos [D] | Rep. Jacqueline Cali-Pitts [D] | Rep. Fred Doucette [R] | Rep. Gerald Ward [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | Pending Motion Inexpedient to Legislate; 01/08/2020; Senate Journal 1 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Sen. Feltes Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/08/2020; Senate Journal 1 |
2019-11-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 01/08/2020; Senate Calendar 47 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Sen. Kahn Moved to Rerefer, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/14/2019; Senate Journal 5 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Sen. Kahn Moved to Remove SB 65 from the Consent Calendar; 02/14/2019; Senate Journal 5 |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; 02/14/2019; Senate Calendar 10 |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Hearing: 01/29/2019, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 10:45 am; Senate Calendar 8 |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Education and Workforce Development; Senate Journal 4 |
Same As/Similar To
SB65 (Carry Over) 2019-11-06 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate