NH SB655 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/05/2020; Senate Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/05/2020; Senate Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to removal of exit ramp tolls on the Everett turnpike in Merrimack.
Title
Relative to removal of exit ramp tolls on the Everett turnpike in Merrimack.
Sponsors
Sen. Shannon Chandley [D] | Sen. Melanie Levesque [D] | Rep. Rosemarie Rung [D] | Rep. Wendy Thomas [D] |
Rep. Nancy Murphy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/05/2020; Senate Journal 5 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 03/05/2020; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 9 |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Hearing: 02/04/2020, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 01:45 pm; Senate Calendar 4 |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 2 |