NH SB656 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to including business impacts in department of transportation engineering and design plans.
Title
Relative to including business impacts in department of transportation engineering and design plans.
Sponsors
Sen. Jay Kahn [D] | Sen. David Watters [D] | Sen. Martha Hennessey [D] | Sen. Donovan Fenton [D] |
Rep. Skip Cleaver [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-23 | House | Died on Table |
2020-06-30 | House | Vacated and Laid on Table Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 4 |
2020-06-03 | House | Introduced 03/12/2020 and referred to Public Works and Highways House Journal 8 P. 227 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2020-0743s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/05/2020; Senate Journal 5 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-0743s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/05/2020; Senate Journal 5 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0743s, 03/05/2020; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 9 |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Hearing: 02/04/2020, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 02:15 pm; Senate Calendar 4 |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 2 |